This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/22/2018 at 08:08:25 (UTC).

James Daniel Davis vs. Airam Secret Mosley

Case Summary

On 09/23/2011 James Daniel Davis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Airam Secret Mosley. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS III, JAMES DANIEL

Defendants

MOSLEY, AIRAM SECRET

MEDEL, SHANTELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEA, PATRICK G

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF PATRICK G SHEA APC

3838 Camino Del Rio North 214

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

BONNO, JOHN F

Attorney at RAFFALOW & RHOADS & BRETOI

9635 Granite Ridge Drive 210

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/19/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/19/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2012
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Davis, James Daniel III. Refers to: Medel, Shantelle; Mosley, Airam Filed By: Davis, James Daniel III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/21/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Status of Mediation process changed to Settled before hearing on 03/19/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place (Case settled before date of mediation) filed by PLOTKIN, BARRY M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • Status of Mediation process changed to Pending mediation on 03/19/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/19/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2012
  • Jury demanded by both parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/19/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • Demand for Jury Trial filed by Medel, Shantelle; Mosley, Airam Secret. Refers to: Davis, James Filed By: Medel, Shantelle (Defendant); Mosley, Airam Secret (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • Answer filed by Mosley, Airam Secret; Medel, Shantelle. Filed By: Mosley, Airam Secret (Defendant); Medel, Shantelle (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • Certificate of Service filed by Davis, James Daniel III. Refers to: Mosley, Airam; Medel, Shantelle Filed By: Davis, James Daniel III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Davis, James Daniel III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Davis, James Daniel III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • Complaint filed by Davis, James Daniel III.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.