This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 18:15:35 (UTC).

James Agelastos vs. Richard Castrellon

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 James Agelastos filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Richard Castrellon. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGELASTOS, JAMES

Defendants and Cross Defendants

LARA, LUIS

CASTRELLON SR, RICHARD

THE HOME DEPOT

HOME DEPOT USA INC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

HOME DEPOT USA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRYOR, DOUGLAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DOUGLAS PRYOR & ASSOCIATES

468 N Camden Drive 300

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

FARMER, JOHN T

Attorney at FARMER CASE & FEDOR

402 West Broadway Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92101

Guy, Douglas D

HOFFMAN, GARY LEE

Attorney at KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

3 Park Plaza 1500

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN, GARY LEE

Attorney at KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

3 Park Plaza 1500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

Order - Other

Order - Other (ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) filed by Home Depot USA Inc. Refers to: Castrellon, Richard; Lara, Luis

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents filed by Lara, Luis; Castrellon, Richard Sr.

Notice of Settlement on Behalf of Defendants/Cross-Defendants Richard Castrellon and Luis Lara

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) filed by Lara, Luis; Castrellon, Richard Sr.

Proposed Order Granting Application of Defendants/Cross-Defendants Richard Castrellon and Luis Lara for Judicial Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Proposed Order submitted by Lara, Luis; Castrellon, Richard Sr received but not filed on 07/17/2019.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Lara, Luis; Castrellon, Richard Sr.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Agelastos, James.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/26/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Opposition to Motion to Contest Good Faith Settlement

Opposition - Other (07/26/2019) filed by Castrellon, Richard Sr.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice (07/26/2019) filed by Castrellon, Richard Sr.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (07/26/2019) filed by Castrellon, Richard Sr.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 50]

Proof of Service

[Another document for ROA# 50]

Request for Judicial Notice

[Another document for ROA# 50]

Opposition to Motion to Contest Good Faith Settlement

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (7/26/19) filed by Castrellon, Richard Sr.

Reply to Opposition to Motion

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Home Depot USA Inc.

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed by Agelastos, James. Filed By: Agelastos, James (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 09/20/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketSummary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/14/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/28/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/02/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Lara, Luis; Castrellon, Richard Sr. Filed By: Lara, Luis (Defendant); Castrellon, Richard Sr (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Lara, Luis; Castrellon, Richard Sr received but not filed on 07/17/2019. Filed By: Lara, Luis (Defendant); Castrellon, Richard Sr (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Frazier,Ronald to Dahlquist,Robert effective 12/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Dahlquist, Robert for 05/10/2019 at 09:30:00 AM in N-29 at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/10/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Agelastos, James. Refers to: Castrellon, Richard; Lara, Luis; The Home Depot Filed By: Agelastos, James (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Agelastos, James. Refers to: Castrellon, Richard; Lara, Luis; The Home Depot Filed By: Agelastos, James (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Agelastos, James. Refers to: Castrellon, Richard; Lara, Luis; The Home Depot; Home Depot USA Inc Filed By: Agelastos, James (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOFFMAN GARY L. ESQ.