Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 04:56:18 (UTC).

Jalilun vs Heras

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Jalilun filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Heras. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jaliliun, Giselle Madalyn

Respondents

Heras, Heidi

Vista, CA 92083

Heras, Haidee

Vista, CA 92083

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention)(Cross-Petition) dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/14/2020 08:30:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 32)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/14/2020 08:30:00 AM. (As Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed WITHOUT prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/24/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCross Petitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 02/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/24/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Heras, Haidee. Refers to: Jaliliun, Giselle Filed By: Heras, Haidee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Cross Petition - Partly GRANTED and Partly DENIED) filed by Heras, Heidi. Refers to: Jaliliun, Giselle Filed By: Heras, Haidee (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Cross Petition) filed by Heras, Heidi. Refers to: Jaliliun, Giselle Filed By: Heras, Haidee (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Jaliliun, Giselle Madalyn. Refers to: Heras, Haidee Filed By: Jaliliun, Giselle Madalyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jaliliun, Giselle Madalyn. Refers to: Heras, Haidee Filed By: Jaliliun, Giselle Madalyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Jaliliun, Giselle Madalyn. Refers to: Heras, Haidee Filed By: Jaliliun, Giselle Madalyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Jaliliun, Giselle Madalyn. Refers to: Heras, Haidee Filed By: Jaliliun, Giselle Madalyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less