Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 10:07:01 (UTC).

Jacovino vs Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Jacovino filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Galan, Raymond

Jacovino, Katherine

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Williams, Ashley

Blakely, Steven

Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association

D&M Realty and Management

BAGOT, WILLIAM

Blakely, Nancy

NN Jaeschke Inc

State of California Department of Social Services

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McClellan, Craig R

Hulburt, Conor J

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Haynes-Garretty, Reetha Lenore

Attorney at BIESTY GARRETTY & WAGNER APC

Lee, Kathryn C.

Dwyer, Ross C

Attorney at TYSON AND MENDES

Fortune, Rebecca J

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

Lewis, Douglas W

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

Brauns, Nicholas D

Attorney at HIGGS FLETCHER & MACK LLP

Doody, Peter S

Attorney at HIGGS FLETCHER & MACK LLP

 

Court Documents

Statement of Damages

Statement of Damages filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond; Galan, Raymond.

Cross-Defendant William Bagot's Answer to Cross-Complaint of Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association and N.N. Jaeschke, Inc.

Answer filed by BAGOT, WILLIAM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by BAGOT, WILLIAM; BAGOT, WILLIAM.

Cross-Defendant William Bagot's Answer to Cross-Complaint of Steven Blakely & Nancy Blakely

Answer filed by BAGOT, WILLIAM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by BAGOT, WILLIAM; BAGOT, WILLIAM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by NN Jaeschke Inc; Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by NN Jaeschke Inc; Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association.

Amendment to Cross-Complaint naming doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Roe 1) filed by Blakely, Nancy; Blakely, Steven. Refers to: State of California Department of Social Services

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by BAGOT, WILLIAM.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (not entered) filed by Blakely, Nancy; Blakely, Steven.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/15/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by D&M Realty and Management.

Defendant William Bagot's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Answer filed by BAGOT, WILLIAM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by BAGOT, WILLIAM.

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: BAGOT, WILLIAM

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: D&M Realty and Management

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association; D&M Realty and Management; BAGOT, WILLIAM; Blakely, Steven; Blakely, Nancy; Williams, Ashley; NN Jaeschke Inc

Declaration - Katherine

Declaration - Other filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association; D&M Realty and Management; BAGOT, WILLIAM; Blakely, Steven; Blakely, Nancy; Williams, Ashley; NN Jaeschke Inc

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketJury demanded by all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 09:15AM before Judge Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 09:00AM before Judge Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/15/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by BAGOT, WILLIAM. Filed By: BAGOT, WILLIAM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by BAGOT, WILLIAM. Filed By: BAGOT, WILLIAM (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: Blakely, Steven Filed By: Jacovino, Katherine (Plaintiff); Jacovino, Katherine (Plaintiff); Galan, Raymond (Plaintiff); Galan, Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association; D&M Realty and Management; BAGOT, WILLIAM; Blakely, Steven; Blakely, Nancy; Williams, Ashley; NN Jaeschke Inc Filed By: Jacovino, Katherine (Plaintiff); Galan, Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association; D&M Realty and Management; BAGOT, WILLIAM; Blakely, Steven; Blakely, Nancy; Williams, Ashley; NN Jaeschke Inc Filed By: Jacovino, Katherine (Plaintiff); Galan, Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association; D&M Realty and Management; BAGOT, WILLIAM; Blakely, Steven; Blakely, Nancy; Williams, Ashley; NN Jaeschke Inc Filed By: Jacovino, Katherine (Plaintiff); Galan, Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association; D&M Realty and Management; BAGOT, WILLIAM; Blakely, Steven; Blakely, Nancy; Williams, Ashley; NN Jaeschke Inc Filed By: Jacovino, Katherine (Plaintiff); Galan, Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Jacovino, Katherine; Galan, Raymond. Refers to: Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association; D&M Realty and Management; BAGOT, WILLIAM; Blakely, Steven; Blakely, Nancy; Williams, Ashley; NN Jaeschke Inc Filed By: Jacovino, Katherine (Plaintiff); Galan, Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tierrasanta Norte Patio Homeowners Association is a litigant

Latest cases where D&M Realty and Management is a litigant

Latest cases where N. N. JAESCHKE INC is a litigant