This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/13/2016 18:17:47

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/21/2010 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by Iptv-b-mc-04 Llc against 2300 Boswell Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company in the jurisdiction of San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXR-SC
  • Filing Date 10/21/2010
  • Case Status Disposed - Dismissed
  • Case Type Property - Other Real Property
  • Jurisdiction San Diego County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse South County Regional Center
  • County San Diego
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant 2300 Boswell Llc A Delaware Limited Liability Company
  • Represented By
    • Pernicka, Charles L
  • Plaintiff Iptv-b-mc-04 Llc
  • Represented By
    • Liao, Gabriel

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Fees Apply
Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/05/2011 at...

Fees Apply
Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 06/06/2...

Fees Apply
Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/02/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Fees Apply
Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard...

Fees Apply
Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/22/201...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2011
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 06/06/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.
  • 05/11/2011
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC. Filed By: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 05/04/2011
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.
  • 04/27/2011
  • Order - Other (APPROVING THE RECEIVER'S FINAL ACCOUNTING) filed by IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC. Refers to: CURTIS, JONATHAN Filed By: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 04/22/2011
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/22/2011 08:35:00 AM.
  • 04/21/2011
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
  • 04/05/2011
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 06/06/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.
  • 04/05/2011
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/05/2011 08:30:00 AM.
  • 03/29/2011
  • Motion - Other (APPROVING THE RECIEVER'S FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT) filed by IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC. Filed By: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 03/10/2011
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/22/2011 at 08:35:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.
  • 03/01/2011
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/05/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.
  • 12/09/2010
  • Answer filed by 2300 Boswell LLC a Delaware limited liability company. Refers to: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC Filed By: 2300 Boswell LLC a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)
  • 11/22/2010
  • Certificate of Service filed by IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC. Refers to: 2300 Boswell LLC a Delaware limited liability company Filed By: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 11/22/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC. Refers to: 2300 Boswell LLC a Delaware limited liability company Filed By: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 11/08/2010
  • Undertaking filed by IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC. Filed By: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 11/08/2010
  • Surety Bond (PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BOND PER CCP 529) filed by IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC. Filed By: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC (Plaintiff)
  • 11/05/2010
  • Declaration - Other (OATH OF RECIEVER) filed by CURTIS, JONATHAN. Refers to: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC Filed By: CURTIS, JONATHAN (Receiver)
  • 11/02/2010
  • Order Confirming Appointment of Receiver and Preliminary Injunction-Rents, Issues, and Profits-Receivership (Stipulation for Appointment of Receiver and Issuance of Preliminary Injunction in Aid of Receiver; Order Appointing Receiver and Preliminary Injunction in Aid of Receiver) filed by IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC.
  • 11/02/2010
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/02/2010 08:30:00 AM.
  • 10/28/2010
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (APPOINTMENT OF RECIEVER/TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER) filed by IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC. Filed By: IPTV-B-MC-04 LLC (Plaintiff)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.