This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 08:07:38 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB VS MURILLO

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MURILLO. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club

Defendants

Beltran, Jose

Murillo, Guadalupe Herrera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McClain, Deborah Lorraine Smith

2601 S Figueroa St

Los Angeles, CA 90007

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Refers to: Murillo, Guadalupe; Beltran, Jose

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Refers to: Murillo, Guadalupe; Beltran, Jose

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Refers to: Murillo, Guadalupe; Beltran, Jose

58803 - Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club.

58802 - Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (for Conditional Settlement and Dismissal Pursuant to CCP 664.6 and Order) filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club; Beltran, Jose.

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Murillo, Guadalupe Herrera .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Beltran, Jose .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (for Conditional Settlement and Dismissal Pursuant to CCP 664.6 and Order) filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club; Beltran, Jose. Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff); Beltran, Jose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Refers to: Murillo, Guadalupe; Beltran, Jose Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Refers to: Murillo, Guadalupe; Beltran, Jose Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club. Refers to: Murillo, Guadalupe; Beltran, Jose Filed By: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCLAIN DEBORAH LORRAINE