Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/23/2020 at 01:46:10 (UTC).

Integral Project Owner II LLC VS Sims

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Integral Project Owner II LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Sims. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Integral Project Owner II LLC

Defendant

Sims, Amy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Eduardo

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal of Does (and All Unknown Occupants) filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (FILED with MOC and Application for court judgment) filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Integral Project Owner II LLC and against Sims, Amy for a grand total of $ 4302.04 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (FILED with MOC and Application for court judgment) filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Does (and All Unknown Occupants) filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Sims, Amy on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Integral Project Owner II LLC. Refers to: Sims, Amy Filed By: Integral Project Owner II LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less