This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 07:03:47 (UTC).

Insurance Company of the West vs Parson

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Insurance Company of the West filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Parson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Insurance Company of the West

Defendants

Parson, Gloria Braithwaite

Parson, Gloria ; ESA : Parson, Gloria Braithwaite

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Longo, Charles A

1540 Apache Dr A

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorney

Farmer, John T

402 W Broadway 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Insurance Company of the West.

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case (37-2020-00025451-CU-PO-CTL) filed by Insurance Company of the West.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Statement of Damages

Statement of Damages filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria

Complaint

Complaint filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria

Answer

Answer filed by Parson, Gloria.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Parson, Gloria. Filed By: Parson, Gloria (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria Filed By: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (37-2020-00025451-CU-PO-CTL) filed by Insurance Company of the West. Filed By: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by Insurance Company of the West. Filed By: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria Filed By: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria Filed By: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria Filed By: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Damages filed by Insurance Company of the West. Refers to: Parson, Gloria Filed By: Insurance Company of the West (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARMER JOHN