This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/05/2018 at 22:32:52 (UTC).

Infinity Insurance Company vs. David Lazaro Almeida

Case Summary

On 02/24/2010 Infinity Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against David Lazaro Almeida. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U-HAUL CO OF ARIZONA

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ABASTILLOS, AGUSTIN ; AKA : ABASTILLAS, AGUSTIN

ALMEIDA, LAZARO DAVID; ESA : ALMEIDA, DAVID LAZARO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BENNETT, MARK B

Attorney at CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATIONAL

GENTES, STEPHEN A

Attorney at GENTES & ASSOCIATES

225 Broadway Suite 1500

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/02/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 12/10/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in S-04 before William S. Cannon at South County.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/10/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/14/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/14/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 03/25/2011 08:35:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/25/2011 08:35:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by U-HAUL CO OF ARIZONA rejected on 07/05/2011.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Almeida, Lazaro David, on 06/07/2010, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by U-HAUL CO OF ARIZONA; Infinity Insurance Company. Filed By: U-HAUL CO OF ARIZONA (Plaintiff); Infinity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by U-HAUL CO OF ARIZONA rejected on 07/05/2011. Filed By: U-HAUL CO OF ARIZONA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/25/2011 08:35:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 03/25/2011 08:35:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2010
  • Answer (Amended) filed by Almeida, Lazaro David. Refers to: Infinity Insurance Company Filed By: Almeida, Lazaro David (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Infinity Insurance Company. Refers to: Almeida, Lazaro Filed By: Infinity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Answer filed by Almeida, Lazaro David.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Almeida, Lazaro David.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2010
  • Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Extension to file certificate of service granted up to 6/14/10 (60 days, final)) filed by Infinity Insurance Company. Refers to: Almeida, Lazaro Filed By: Infinity Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Infinity Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Infinity Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Infinity Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.