This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 09:02:33 (UTC).

In the Matter of Whittier College J. Allan Cook & Mary Schalling Cook Fund

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 In the Matter of Whittier College J Allan Cook Mary Schalling Cook Fund was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Bostwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Bostwick

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Whittier College

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cunneen, Dawn

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Miscellaneous) scheduled for 09/01/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Petition - Other

Petition - Other (Petition to Modify Endowment Fund) filed by Whittier College.

Request To Take Matter Off Calendar Local Rule 4.4.4

Request - Other (Request to Take Matter Off Calendar Pursuant to Local Rule 4.4.4) filed by Whittier College.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingLocation: 504; Event Type: Other (Miscellaneous) - Petition - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Other (Request to Take Matter Off Calendar Pursuant to Local Rule 4.4.4) filed by Whittier College. Filed By: Whittier College (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Miscellaneous) scheduled for 09/01/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other (Petition to Modify Endowment Fund) filed by Whittier College. Filed By: Whittier College (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITTIER COLLEGE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cunneen, Dawn Hall