This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/15/2021 at 09:14:50 (UTC).

In the Matter of the The Bruce W. Slesnick Living Trust Dated June 19, 2006, as Amended

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 In the Matter of the The Bruce W Slesnick Living Trust Dated June 19, 2006, as Amended was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Bostwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Bostwick

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Caspi, Leslie

Caspi, Tamar

Not Classified By Court

The Bruce W. Slesnick Living Trust Dated June 19, 2006, as Amended

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Taylor, Joshua D.

Attorney at KEYSTONE LAW GROUP P C

11300 W Olympic Boulevard 910

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Kaufman, Roee

11300 W Olympic Boulevard Suite 910

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Blaser, Ashley

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Trust Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

Trust Coversheet filed by Caspi, Tamar; Caspi, Leslie. Refers to: The Bruce W. Slesnick Living Trust Dated June 19, 2006, as Amended

Trust Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

Trust Coversheet filed by Caspi, Tamar; Caspi, Leslie. Refers to: The Bruce W. Slesnick Living Trust Dated June 19, 2006, as Amended

Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts (Case Initiation)

Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts (Petition for: (1) Court Order Confirming Ownership of Sale Proceeds; (2) Breach of Fiduciary Duty Under Family Code Section 1101; and (3) Constructive Trust) filed by Caspi, Tamar; Caspi, Leslie. Refers to: The Bruce W. Slesnick Living Trust Dated June 19, 2006, as Amended

Notice of Hearing (Notices)

Notice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property filed by Caspi, Tamar.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingLocation: 504; Event Type: Other (Trusts) - Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property filed by Caspi, Tamar. Filed By: Caspi, Tamar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts (Petition for: (1) Court Order Confirming Ownership of Sale Proceeds; (2) Breach of Fiduciary Duty Under Family Code Section 1101; and (3) Constructive Trust) filed by Caspi, Tamar; Caspi, Leslie. Refers to: The Bruce W. Slesnick Living Trust Dated June 19, 2006, as Amended Filed By: Caspi, Tamar (Petitioner); Caspi, Leslie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrust Coversheet filed by Caspi, Tamar; Caspi, Leslie. Refers to: The Bruce W. Slesnick Living Trust Dated June 19, 2006, as Amended Filed By: Caspi, Tamar (Petitioner); Caspi, Leslie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrust Coversheet filed by Caspi, Tamar; Caspi, Leslie. Refers to: The Bruce W. Slesnick Living Trust Dated June 19, 2006, as Amended Filed By: Caspi, Tamar (Petitioner); Caspi, Leslie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAUFMAN ROEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR JOSHUA D.