This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/23/2020 at 00:05:17 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Steve and May Vilicich Family Trust, dated February 12, 1999

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 In the Matter of The Steve and May Vilicich Family Trust, dated February 12, 1999 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia C. Kelety. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Julia C. Kelety

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BYERLY, STEPHANIE

Not Classified By Court

The Steve and May Vilicich Family Trust, dated February 12, 1999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Harris, Ann Catherine

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Petition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party was rescheduled to 06/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party scheduled for 06/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by BYERLY, STEPHANIE.

Petition - Other

Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts (Petition for Court Order to Establish Legal Title To Property Held by Decedent At Death) filed by BYERLY, STEPHANIE. Refers to: The Steve and May Vilicich Family Trust, dated February 12, 1999

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Petition - Other

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • HearingLocation: 503; Event Type: Petition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party - Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Petition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party was rescheduled to 06/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party scheduled for 06/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by BYERLY, STEPHANIE. Filed By: BYERLY, STEPHANIE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Trust Coversheet filed by BYERLY, STEPHANIE. Filed By: BYERLY, STEPHANIE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts (Petition for Court Order to Establish Legal Title To Property Held by Decedent At Death) filed by BYERLY, STEPHANIE. Refers to: The Steve and May Vilicich Family Trust, dated February 12, 1999 Filed By: BYERLY, STEPHANIE (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 5]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.