This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/01/2018 at 09:18:03 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Philip N. Thren Trust Dated November 1, 1996, as amended and restated on December 11, 2013

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 In the Matter of The Philip N Thren Trust Dated November 1, 1996, as amended and restated on December 11, 2013 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT LONGSTRETH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT LONGSTRETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ST. AUGUSTINE'S SCHOOL OF SAN DIEGO

Respondent

RODRIGUEZ, ERIKA

Not Classified By Court

THE PHILIP N. THREN TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 1, 1996, AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON DECEMBER 11, 2013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PERLIN, SCOTT W.

750 B Street 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent Attorney

TRESP, ELIZABETH A

Attorney at ELIZABETH A TRESP ATTORNEY AT LAW

341 S Cedros Ave F

Solana Beach, CA 92075

 

Court Documents

Supplement to Response and Objections to Petition to Determine Validity of Purported Trust and to Impose Constructive Trust

Supplement - Other (Supplement to Response and Objections to Petition to Determinevalidity of Purported Trust and to Impose Constructive Trust) filed by Rodriguez, Erika.

Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet

Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Erika.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego.

Reply to Petitioner's Objections to Declaration of Erika Rodriguez

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Rodriguez, Erika.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Kim Ross) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Rodriguez, Erika.

Declaration of Annie Tai in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Annie Tai in Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time for Motion to Compel, or Alternatively, Setting Motion for Hearing Prior to June 7, 2018 Case Management Conference) filed by Rodriguez, Erika.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ([Law & Motion] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Privelege Log in Response to Petitioner's Notice of Respondent Erika Rodriguez's Deposition with Request for Production of Documents) filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Probate Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 07/20/2018 at 02:00:00 PM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego.

Declaration of Erika Rodriguez in Opposition to Motion to Compel

Declaration - Other filed by Rodriguez, Erika.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego.

Petition - Subsequent Other

Supplement to Petition (Supplemental Petition to Determine Validity of Purported Trust and to Impose Constructive Trust) filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Other (Trusts) heard 08/15/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego.

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Probate) heard 07/20/2018 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing (Probate) heard 07/20/2018 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Probate Case Management Conference heard 07/20/2018 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Probate Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 01/10/2019 at 10:30AM before Judge Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Kim Ross) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Probate) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing (Probate) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing (Probate) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Probate) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • Other (Trusts) continued pursuant to party's motion to 01/08/2018 at 02:15PM before Judge Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Objections - Trust (Response and Objections to Petition to Determine Validity of Purported Trust and to Impose Constructive Trust) filed by Rodriguez, Erika. Filed By: Rodriguez, Erika (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego. Filed By: St. Augustine's School of San Diego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Petition (Supplemental Petition to Determine Validity of Purported Trust and to Impose Constructive Trust) filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego. Filed By: St. Augustine's School of San Diego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego. Filed By: St. Augustine's School of San Diego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego. Filed By: St. Augustine's School of San Diego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Other (Trusts) scheduled for 08/15/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition to Determine Validity of Purported Trust and to Impose Constructive Trust) filed by St. Augustine's School of San Diego. Refers to: The Philip N. Thren Trust Dated November 1, 1996, as amended and restated on December 11, 2013; Rodriguez, Erika Filed By: St. Augustine's School of San Diego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less