This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/14/2021 at 09:11:02 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Philip F. Warren 1997 Family Trust Dated november 2, 1997

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 In the Matter of The Philip F Warren 1997 Family Trust Dated november 2, 1997 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Bostwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Bostwick

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Warren, Lauren

Not Classified By Court

The Philip F. Warren 1997 Family Trust Dated November 2, 1997

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cunneen, Dawn

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Warren, Lauren.

Petition to Compel Redress for Breach of Trust; Petition for Damages for Breach of Fiduciary Duties; Objections to Account; Petition to compel Delivery of Trust Records to Beneficiary; Petition to Compel Code Compliant Account and Report; etc.

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition to Compel Redress for Breach of Trust; Petition for Damages for Breach of Fiduciary Duties; Objections to Account; Petition to compel Delivery of Trust Records to Beneficiary; Petition to Compel Code Compliant Account and Report; etc.) filed by Warren, Lauren. Refers to: The Philip F. Warren 1997 Family Trust Dated November 2, 1997

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingLocation: 504; Event Type: Other (Trusts) - Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Warren, Lauren. Filed By: Warren, Lauren (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition to Compel Redress for Breach of Trust; Petition for Damages for Breach of Fiduciary Duties; Objections to Account; Petition to compel Delivery of Trust Records to Beneficiary; Petition to Compel Code Compliant Account and Report; etc.) filed by Warren, Lauren. Refers to: The Philip F. Warren 1997 Family Trust Dated November 2, 1997 Filed By: Warren, Lauren (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketConfidential Trust Coversheet filed by Warren, Lauren. Filed By: Warren, Lauren (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cunneen, Dawn Hall