This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/18/2022 at 02:03:06 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Marsha Jean Purser Living Trust Dated October 16, 2020

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 In the Matter of the Marsha Jean Purser Living Trust Dated October 16, 2020 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia C. Kelety. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Julia C. Kelety

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jackson, David

Not Classified By Court

Marsha Jean Purser Living Trust Dated October 16, 2020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cross, Oleg

5190 Governor Dr Ste 108

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust; Confirm Trustee; and Confirm Assets to Revocable Trust) filed by Jackson, David. Refers to: Marsha Jean Purser Living Trust Dated October 16, 2020

Trust Coversheet

Trust Coversheet filed by Jackson, David.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property

Notice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property filed by Jackson, David.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Jackson, David.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: 503; Event Type: Other (Trusts) - Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Jackson, David.; Filed By: Jackson, David (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition to Determine Claim to Property filed by Jackson, David.; Filed By: Jackson, David (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrust Coversheet filed by Jackson, David.; Filed By: Jackson, David (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition for an Order to Confirm Validity of Trust; Confirm Trustee; and Confirm Assets to Revocable Trust) filed by Jackson, David. Refers to: Marsha Jean Purser Living Trust Dated October 16, 2020; Filed By: Jackson, David (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less