This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/11/2020 at 07:26:15 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Marjorie L. Pettitt 1999 Separate Property Trust Dated February 18, 1999

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 In the Matter of The Marjorie L Pettitt 1999 Separate Property Trust Dated February 18, 1999 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia C. Kelety. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Julia C. Kelety

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pettitt, Robert

Not Classified By Court

The Marjorie L. Pettitt 1999 Separate Property Trust Dated February 18, 1999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jensen, K. Brooke

Stewart, Richard Scott

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Other (Trusts) was rescheduled to 06/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 06/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Pettitt, Robert.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Pettitt, Robert; Pettitt, Robert.

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition to Compel Trustee to Provide an Accounting From the Date of Trustee Acceptance) filed by Pettitt, Robert. Refers to: The Marjorie L. Pettitt 1999 Separate Property Trust Dated February 18, 1999

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • HearingLocation: 503; Event Type: Other (Trusts) - Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Other (Trusts) was rescheduled to 06/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 06/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Pettitt, Robert. Filed By: Pettitt, Robert (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Pettitt, Robert; Pettitt, Robert. Filed By: Pettitt, Robert (Petitioner); Pettitt, Robert (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition to Compel Trustee to Provide an Accounting From the Date of Trustee Acceptance) filed by Pettitt, Robert. Refers to: The Marjorie L. Pettitt 1999 Separate Property Trust Dated February 18, 1999 Filed By: Pettitt, Robert (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.