This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/24/2020 at 01:28:41 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Lodginski Family Trust, Dated January 25, 2005

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 In the Matter of The Lodginski Family Trust, Dated January 25, 2005 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Longstreth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert Longstreth

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Franey, Christine Marie

Ross, Donna Frances

Not Classified By Court

The Lodginski Family Trust, Dated January 25, 2005

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sanders-Young, Susan J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Other (Trusts) was rescheduled to 07/10/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Other (Trusts) was rescheduled to 05/22/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 05/22/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Franey, Christine Marie; Ross, Donna Frances.

Consent - Other

Consent - Other filed by Franey, Christine Marie; Ross, Donna Frances.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Franey, Christine Marie; Ross, Donna Frances.

Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts

Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts (Petition to Establish Trust's Claim of Ownership to Property and for Order Directing its Transfer to Trust) filed by Ross, Donna Frances; Franey, Christine Marie. Refers to: The Lodginski Family Trust, Dated January 25, 2005

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 04/03/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Other (Trusts) - Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Other (Trusts) was rescheduled to 07/10/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Other (Trusts) was rescheduled to 05/22/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 05/22/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Franey, Christine Marie; Ross, Donna Frances. Filed By: Franey, Christine Marie (Petitioner); Ross, Donna Frances (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent - Other filed by Franey, Christine Marie; Ross, Donna Frances. Filed By: Franey, Christine Marie (Petitioner); Ross, Donna Frances (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Franey, Christine Marie; Ross, Donna Frances. Filed By: Franey, Christine Marie (Petitioner); Ross, Donna Frances (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts (Petition to Establish Trust's Claim of Ownership to Property and for Order Directing its Transfer to Trust) filed by Ross, Donna Frances; Franey, Christine Marie. Refers to: The Lodginski Family Trust, Dated January 25, 2005 Filed By: Ross, Donna Frances (Petitioner); Franey, Christine Marie (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 04/03/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.