This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:30:15 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Jerome and Marion Weir Rovocable Living Trust as Restated on May 20, 2008 as amended on January 12, 2010

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 In the Matter of the Jerome and Marion Weir Rovocable Living Trust as Restated on May 20, 2008 as amended on January 12, 2010 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Longstreth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert Longstreth

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Ellington-Rowe, Christine

Wierzbicki-Roach, Geraldine

Not Classified By Court

The Jerome and Marion Weir Rovocable Living Trust as Restated on May 20, 2008 as amended on January 12, 2010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Armstrong, Michael F

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL F ARMSTRONG

 

Court Documents

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (1) Petition for Breach of Trust; Recovery of Trust Property; For Statutory Damages and Attorney's Fees; 2) For Determination of Ownership of Property by Court and Order Directing Transfer to Trust; 3) For Suspension and Removal of Trustee and ...) filed by Ellington-Rowe, Christine; Wierzbicki-Roach, Geraldine. Refers to: The Jerome and Marion Weir Rovocable Living Trust as Restated on May 20, 2008 as amended on January 12, 2010

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Other (Trusts) - Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (1) Petition for Breach of Trust; Recovery of Trust Property; For Statutory Damages and Attorney's Fees; 2) For Determination of Ownership of Property by Court and Order Directing Transfer to Trust; 3) For Suspension and Removal of Trustee and ...) filed by Ellington-Rowe, Christine; Wierzbicki-Roach, Geraldine. Refers to: The Jerome and Marion Weir Rovocable Living Trust as Restated on May 20, 2008 as amended on January 12, 2010 Filed By: Ellington-Rowe, Christine (Petitioner); Wierzbicki-Roach, Geraldine (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less