This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 06:15:34 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Hayward A Olson Trust, Dated December 5, 1991

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 In the Matter of The Hayward A Olson Trust, Dated December 5, 1991 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HILL, JOYCE M

Not Classified By Court

THE HAYWARD A OLSON TRUST, DATED DECEMBER 5, 1991

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BLAKESPEAR, CATHERINE S

1330 Camino Del Mar

Del Mar, CA 92014

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Consent - Other

Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Consent - Other

Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Consent - Other

Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Consent - Other

Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Consent - Other

Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Consent - Other

Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Supplement to Petition

Supplement to Petition filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Modification heard 05/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Attachment - Other

Attachment - Other (Exhibits to Petition - Trust Restatment and Amendent) filed by Hill, Joyce M.

Petition for Modification of Terms of the Trust; and for Appointment of Co-Trustees and Successor Trustees

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) filed by Hill, Joyce M. Refers to: The Hayward A Olson Trust, Dated December 5, 1991

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Modification scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Supplement to Petition

Supplement to Petition filed by Hill, Joyce M.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Attachment - Other (Exhibits to Petition - Trust Restatment and Amendent) filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Modification heard 05/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)(Petition for Modification of Terms of the Trust; and for Appointment of Co-Trustees and Successor Trustees) filed by Joyce M. Hill was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Petition filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Petition filed by Hill, Joyce M. Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Modification scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) filed by Hill, Joyce M. Refers to: The Hayward A Olson Trust, Dated December 5, 1991 Filed By: Hill, Joyce M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less