This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/23/2020 at 00:04:57 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Granville E. and Louise L. Pike Trust dated December 24, 1986

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 In the Matter of The Granville E and Louise L Pike Trust dated December 24, 1986 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia C. Kelety. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Julia C. Kelety

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pike, Carol

Not Classified By Court

The Granville E. and Louise L. Pike Trust dated December 24, 1986

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Denny, Keith R.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Instructions

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Trustee's Petition for Instructions Per Prod. Code 17200 et seq. Regarding Disposition of Trust) filed by Pike, Carol. Refers to: The Granville E. and Louise L. Pike Trust dated December 24, 1986

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Trustee's Petition for Instructions Per Prod. Code 17200 et seq. Regarding Disposition of Trust) filed by Pike, Carol. Refers to: The Granville E. and Louise L. Pike Trust dated December 24, 1986 Filed By: Pike, Carol (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.