This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 11:17:24 (UTC).

In The Matter of The Charles P. Frazier Trust Dated December 20, 2019

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 In The Matter of The Charles P Frazier Trust Dated December 20, 2019 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John B Scherling. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John B Scherling

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pagano, Kelly A

Respondent

Haun, Theodore

Not Classified By Court

In The Matter of The Charles P. Frazier Trust Dated December 20, 2019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Murphy, John J III

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN J MURPHY III APC

Respondent Attorneys

Achtel, Roland H

Attorney at HIGGS FLETCHER AND MACK LLP

Ingold, Scott J

Attorney at HIGGS FLETCHER & MACK LLP

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY

Objections - Other (Objection to Petition to Determine Title to Real Property; to Confirm Trust Ownership of Property; for an Order Transferring Title to Real Property; to Recover Property Wrongfully Taken From Trustor's Trust; for Damages and Attorneys' Fees Pursuant..) filed by Haun, Theodore.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Haun, Theodore.

Theodore Haun and Jeffrey Frazier's Joinder in Objection to Petition

Joinder - Other (Theodore Haun and Jeffery Frazier's Joinder in Objection to Petition to Determine Title to Real Property; to Confirm Trust Ownership of Property; etc...) filed by Haun, Theodore; Frazier, Jeffery.

Proof of Service Re: Theodore Haun and Jeffrey Frazier's Joinder to Objection to Petition

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Service) filed by Haun, Theodore; Frazier, Jeffery.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Other (Trusts) heard 08/28/2020 10:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Haun, Theodore.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Probate Case Management Conference heard 12/10/2020 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Longstreth,Robert to Scherling,John effective 01/09/2021

Substitution of Attorney - Jeffrey Frazier

Substitution of Attorney filed by Frazier, Jeffery; Haun, Theodore.

Substitution of Attorney - Theodore Haun

Substitution of Attorney filed by Frazier, Jeffery; Haun, Theodore.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Pagano, Kelly A.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Pagano, Kelly A.

Request for Special Notice

Request for Special Notice filed by Shriners Hospitals for Children.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Bostwick, Jeffrey to Robert Longstreth effective 06/19/2020

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Other (Trusts) reassigned to Robert Longstreth for 08/28/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in 502 at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Trusts) scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition to Determine Title to Real Property; to Confirm Trust Ownership of Property; for an Order Transferring Title to Real Property; to Recover Property Wrongfully Taken from Trustor's Trust; for Damages and Attorneys' Fees Pursuant...) filed by Pagano, Kelly A. Refers to: In The Matter of The Charles P. Frazier Trust Dated December 20, 2019

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Pagano, Kelly A.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Probate Case Management Conference - Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Frazier, Jeffery; Haun, Theodore. Filed By: Frazier, Jeffery (Respondent); Haun, Theodore (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Frazier, Jeffery; Haun, Theodore. Filed By: Frazier, Jeffery (Respondent); Haun, Theodore (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2021
  • DocketProbate Case Management Conference reassigned to Scherling, John for 04/22/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in 502 at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Longstreth,Robert to Scherling,John effective 01/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProbate Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 04/22/2021 at 10:30AM before Judge Robert Longstreth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Probate Case Management Conference heard 12/10/2020 10:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Haun, Theodore. Filed By: Haun, Theodore (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOther (Trusts) continued pursuant to party's motion to 12/10/2020 at 10:30AM before Judge Robert Longstreth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Other (Trusts) heard 08/28/2020 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Pagano, Kelly A. Filed By: Pagano, Kelly A (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Pagano, Kelly A. Filed By: Pagano, Kelly A (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Bostwick, Jeffrey to Robert Longstreth effective 06/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) reassigned to Robert Longstreth for 08/28/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in 502 at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition to Determine Title to Real Property; to Confirm Trust Ownership of Property; for an Order Transferring Title to Real Property; to Recover Property Wrongfully Taken from Trustor's Trust; for Damages and Attorneys' Fees Pursuant...) filed by Pagano, Kelly A. Refers to: In The Matter of The Charles P. Frazier Trust Dated December 20, 2019 Filed By: Pagano, Kelly A (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Pagano, Kelly A. Filed By: Pagano, Kelly A (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACHTEL ROLAND H

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ingold, Scott J