This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 06:30:30 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Cammie Mullen Testamentary Trust Dated July 6, 1962

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 In the Matter of The Cammie Mullen Testamentary Trust Dated July 6, 1962 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

BRANDY, DONALD

MULLEN, ROBERT

LEVINGSTON, VESTER

Not Classified By Court

THE CAMMIE MULLEN TESTAMENTARY TRUST DATED JULY 6, 1962

LEVINGSTON, VESTER

Trustee

TOLSTAD, SCOTT C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

WRIGHT, ERNEST

525 B Street 1500

San Diego, CA 92101

WEBB, RONALD R

5440 Morehouse 3700

San Diego, CA 92121

SOADY, SCOTT C

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SCOTT C SOADY APC

16466 Bernardo Center Drive 260

San Diego, CA 92128

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Brandy, Donald.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Order Appointing Appraiser and Inheritance Tax Appraiser) filed by Superior Court of California County of San Diego.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Mullen, Robert.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication (Certificate of Publication) filed by Mullen, Robert.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Property Agreement) filed by Mullen, Robert.

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim (Ralph Gano Miller, Jr.; $80.00) filed by Ralph Gano Miller, Jr.

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim (Mount Hope Cemetery; $277.50) filed by Mount Hope Cemetery.

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim (John George Ronis, Attorney at Law; $375.00) filed by John George Ronis, Attorney at Law.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Hearing) filed by Superior Court of California County of San Diego.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Hearing) filed by Superior Court of California County of San Diego.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Recapitulation) filed by Mullen, Robert.

Receipt - Other

Receipt - Other (Receipt of Robert Mullen, as Trustee) filed by Mullen, Robert.

Accounting - Initial - Testamentary Trust

Accounting - Initial - Testamentary Trust (First Account and Report by Vester Livingston of the Administration of the Trust for the Period of April 14, 2010 to December 31, 2016) filed by Levingston, Vester.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Accounting scheduled for 02/01/2018 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Petition of Scott C.Tolstad trustee confirming trust assets as property of the Cammie Mullen Testamentary Trust Dated July 6, 1962

Petition for Instructions - Testamentary Trust (Petition of Scott C.Tolstad Trustee Confirming Trust Assets As Property of the Cammie Mullen Testamentary Trust Dated July 6, 1962) filed by Tolstad, Scott C..

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Instructions scheduled for 02/20/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Brandy, Donald.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 05/30/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Instructions heard 02/20/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Petition for Instructions continued pursuant to party's motion to 06/11/2018 at 09:30AM before Judge Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Brandy, Donald. Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Objections - Trust (Objection to Petition of Scott C. Tolstad, Trustee (A) Confirming Trust Assets as Property of the Cammie Mullen Testamentary Trust Dated July 6, 1962; (B) Ascertaining Beneficiaries; (C) Determining Entitlement to Trust Distributions...) filed by Brandy, Donald. Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Accounting heard 02/01/2018 02:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Accounting continued pursuant to party's motion to 06/11/2018 at 09:30AM before Judge Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Brandy, Donald. Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Objections - Trust (Objections to Petition to Approve First Accountand Report of Vester Levingston of the Administrationof the Trust for the Period of April 14, 2010 to December 31, 2016; and Petition for Surcharge) filed by Brandy, Donald. Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Brandy, Donald. Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Instructions scheduled for 02/20/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Petition filed by Brandy, Donald. Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Brandy, Donald. Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Petition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 05/30/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 05/30/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 05/30/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Trust Coversheet filed by Brandy, Donald. Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Trust Coversheet filed by Brandy, Donald. Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition to Compel Trustee to Account; to Remove Trustee; and to Appoint Successor Trustee) filed by Brandy, Donald. Refers to: The Cammie Mullen Testamentary Trust Dated July 6, 1962 Filed By: Brandy, Donald (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less