This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/01/2021 at 09:01:51 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Butler Family Trust Dated December 17, 1997

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 In the Matter of The Butler Family Trust Dated December 17, 1997 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Bostwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Bostwick

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Butler, IV, Thomas F.

Saenz, Laura C.

Not Classified By Court

The Butler Family Trust Dated December 17, 1997

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Le, Lamdien T

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Petition for Order Determining Existence of Trust [Cal. Prob Code Section 172009a)]; Removal of Trustee [Cal. Prob. Code Section 15642, 17200(b)(10)] and Accounting of Trustee [Cal. Prob. Code, Sections 16064(a), 17200(b)(7)(C)]

Petition for Removal of Trustee (Petition for: (1) Order Determining Existence of Trust; (2) Removal of Trusee; (3) Accounting of Trustee) filed by Saenz, Laura C.; Butler, IV, Thomas F.. Refers to: The Butler Family Trust Dated December 17, 1997

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Order Determining Existence Of Trust [Cal. Prob. Code, Section 17200(A)]; Removal Of Trustee [Cal. Prob. Code, Sections 15642, 7200(B)(10)]; And Accounting Of Trustee [Cal. Prob. Code, Sections 16062, 16064(A), 17200(B)(7)(C)]

Amended Petition (Amended Petition for (1) Order Determining Existence of Trust [Cal. PC Sect. 17200(a)]; (2) Removal of Trustee [Cal. PC Sects. 15642, 17200(b)(10)]; and (3) Accounting of Trustee [Cal. PC Sects. 16062, 16064(a), 17200(b)(7)(C)]) filed by Saenz, Laura C.; Butler, IV, Thomas F..

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: 504; Event Type: Petition for Removal (Trusts) - Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPetition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPetition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Removal (Trusts) scheduled for 04/21/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition (Amended Petition for (1) Order Determining Existence of Trust [Cal. PC Sect. 17200(a)]; (2) Removal of Trustee [Cal. PC Sects. 15642, 17200(b)(10)]; and (3) Accounting of Trustee [Cal. PC Sects. 16062, 16064(a), 17200(b)(7)(C)]) filed by Saenz, Laura C.; Butler, IV, Thomas F.. Filed By: Saenz, Laura C. (Petitioner); Butler, IV, Thomas F. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Removal of Trustee (Petition for: (1) Order Determining Existence of Trust; (2) Removal of Trusee; (3) Accounting of Trustee) filed by Saenz, Laura C.; Butler, IV, Thomas F.. Refers to: The Butler Family Trust Dated December 17, 1997 Filed By: Saenz, Laura C. (Petitioner); Butler, IV, Thomas F. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Butler Family Trust Dated December 17, 1997 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE LAMDIEN THANH