This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/04/2018 at 02:15:09 (UTC).

In the Matter of The Arlene L. Shafer Separate Property Trust, dtd. 02/06/1986 as amended

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 In the Matter of The Arlene L Shafer Separate Property Trust, dtd 02/06/1986 as amended was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT LONGSTRETH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT LONGSTRETH

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SHAFER, GEORGE ; AKA : SHAFER, GEORGE A.

SHAFER, MARK ; AKA : SHAFER, MARK H.

Not Classified By Court

THE ARLENE L. SHAFER SEPARATE PROPERTY TRUST, DTD. AS AMENDED

WEIBLE, ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SANCHEZ, JAMES V

4154 Norse Way

Long Beach, CA 90808

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

OWENS, MATTHEW R.

101 W Broadway 1000

San Diego, CA 92101

MOFFIT, JEREMIAH J

Attorney at WITHERS BERGMAN

101 W Broadway 1000

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other (Stipulation for Entry of Judgment of Dismissal Under CCP 664.6 & CRC R. 3.1385; Order) filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (A. Angulo CSR 13824) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Weible, Anthony.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Probate Case Management Conference heard 01/22/2018 02:00:00 PM.

Petition for Removal of Trustee

Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition for Orders: 1) Removing Anthony Weible as Trustee of the Trust; and 2) Naming George Shafer as Temporary Trustee; and 3) Directing Anthony Weible to Deliver All Trust Assets to George Shafer as Temporary Trustee; and 4) Precluding and Restra) filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Refers to: The Arlene L. Shafer Separate Property Trust, dtd. 02/06/1986 as amended

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Existing Hearings of Counsel and Request for Hearing Setting) filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark.

Supplement to Petition

Supplement to Petition filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark.

Response and Objection to Petition for Orders Removing Client as Trustee, Etc.

Objections - Trust (Response and Objection to Petition for Orders 1) Removing Anthony Weible as Trustee of the Trust; 2) Naming George Shafer as Temporary Trustee; 3) Directing Anthony Weible to Deliver All Trust Assets to George Shafer as Temporary Trustee...) filed by Weible, Anthony.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Weible, Anthony.

Declaration of Anthony Weible Regarding Trust Accounting

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Anthony Weible Regarding Trust Accounting) filed by Weible, Anthony.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Weible, Anthony.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Other (Trusts) heard 10/10/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Declaration of Anthony Weible Regarding Second Trust Accounting

Declaration - Other filed by Weible, Anthony; Weible, Anthony.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Weible, Anthony; Weible, Anthony.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other (Stipulation for Entry of Judgment of Dismissal Under CCP 664.6 & CRC R. 3.1385; Order) filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Filed By: Shafer, George (Petitioner); Shafer, Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • Probate Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/17/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Probate Case Management Conference heard 01/22/2018 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Probate Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 05/17/2018 at 10:30AM before Judge Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (A. Angulo CSR 13824) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Weible, Anthony. Filed By: Weible, Anthony (Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Weible, Anthony. Filed By: Weible, Anthony (Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Filed By: Shafer, George (Petitioner); Shafer, Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Weible, Anthony; Weible, Anthony. Filed By: Weible, Anthony (Objector); Weible, Anthony (Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed by Weible, Anthony; Weible, Anthony. Filed By: Weible, Anthony (Objector); Weible, Anthony (Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Filed By: Shafer, George (Petitioner); Shafer, Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Filed By: Shafer, George (Petitioner); Shafer, Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Petition filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Filed By: Shafer, George (Petitioner); Shafer, Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Filed By: Shafer, George (Petitioner); Shafer, Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Other (Trusts) scheduled for 10/10/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Trust Coversheet filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Filed By: Shafer, George (Petitioner); Shafer, Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Existing Hearings of Counsel and Request for Hearing Setting) filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Filed By: Shafer, George (Petitioner); Shafer, Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition for Orders: 1) Removing Anthony Weible as Trustee of the Trust; and 2) Naming George Shafer as Temporary Trustee; and 3) Directing Anthony Weible to Deliver All Trust Assets to George Shafer as Temporary Trustee; and 4) Precluding and Restra) filed by Shafer, George; Shafer, Mark. Refers to: The Arlene L. Shafer Separate Property Trust, dtd. 02/06/1986 as amended Filed By: Shafer, George (Petitioner); Shafer, Mark (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less