This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 09:00:38 (UTC).

In the matter of The Albinas E. and Rosemary M. Adams Living Trust dated October 18, 2000

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 In the matter of The Albinas E and Rosemary M Adams Living Trust dated October 18, 2000 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Bostwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Bostwick

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Adams, Linda Marie

Gress, Adam L.

Not Classified By Court

The Albinas E. and Rosemary M. Adams Living Trust dated October 18, 2000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Cross, Oleg

5190 Governor Dr Ste 108

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Successor Trustee

Order Appointing Successor Trustee (Order Granting Ex Parte Petition for Order: (1) Confirming Adam L Gress as the Successor Trustee...) filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.

Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/31/2022 08:45:00 AM.

Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Petition

[Proposed] Order (Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Petition) submitted by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie received but not filed on 05/31/2022.

Response to Probate Notes

Response to Probate Notes filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.

Declaration of Rosemary Kaplar

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Rosemary Kaplar) filed by Overton, Barbara.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Adam L. Gress' Ex Parte Petition for Order

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Adam L. Gress' Ex Parte Petition for Order) filed by Overton, Barbara.

Declaration of Don Laff

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Don Laff) filed by Overton, Barbara.

Declaration of Barbara Overton

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Barbara Overton, Surviving Co-trustee of The Survivor's Trust of The Albinas E. and Rosemary M. Adams Living Trust) filed by Overton, Barbara.

Declaration of Attorney Richard A. Higgins

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Attorney Richard A. Huggins) filed by Overton, Barbara.

Acceptance of Nomination and Consent to Serve as Successor Trustee by Adam L. Gress

Consent - Other filed by Gress, Adam L..

Proof of Service - PERSONAL

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Ex Parte scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Trust Coversheet

Trust Coversheet filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Edward Sutter in Support of Petitioners Adam L. Gress and Linda M. Adams' Ex Parte Petition for Order: (1) Confirming Adam L. Gress as Successor Trustee...) filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (Orde Granting Ex Parte Petition for Order: (1) Confiring Adam L. Gress as Successor Trustee; (2) In the Alternative...) submitted by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie received but not filed on 05/17/2022.

Ex Parte Petition to Confirm Trustee or Alternatively Suspend Trustee Powers

Ex Parte Petition for Probate (Ex Parte Petition for Order: (1) Confirming Adam L. Gress as Successor Trustee; (2) In the Alternative, Suspending Trustee Powers of Barbara Overton, Appointing a Temporary Trustee, And Ordering Surrender of Trust Property to Said Temporary Trustee) filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingLocation: 504; Event Type: Other (Trusts) - Petition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Successor Trustee (Order Granting Ex Parte Petition for Order: (1) Confirming Adam L Gress as the Successor Trustee...) filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/31/2022 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Proposed] Order (Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Petition) submitted by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie received but not filed on 05/31/2022.; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Probate Notes filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Rosemary Kaplar) filed by Overton, Barbara.; Filed By: Overton, Barbara (Objector)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Adam L. Gress' Ex Parte Petition for Order) filed by Overton, Barbara.; Filed By: Overton, Barbara (Objector)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Don Laff) filed by Overton, Barbara.; Filed By: Overton, Barbara (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Barbara Overton, Surviving Co-trustee of The Survivor's Trust of The Albinas E. and Rosemary M. Adams Living Trust) filed by Overton, Barbara.; Filed By: Overton, Barbara (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Edward Sutter in Support of Petitioners Adam L. Gress and Linda M. Adams' Ex Parte Petition for Order: (1) Confirming Adam L. Gress as Successor Trustee...) filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (Orde Granting Ex Parte Petition for Order: (1) Confiring Adam L. Gress as Successor Trustee; (2) In the Alternative...) submitted by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie received but not filed on 05/17/2022.; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Probate (Ex Parte Petition for Order: (1) Confirming Adam L. Gress as Successor Trustee; (2) In the Alternative, Suspending Trustee Powers of Barbara Overton, Appointing a Temporary Trustee, And Ordering Surrender of Trust Property to Said Temporary Trustee) filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie.; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther (Trusts) scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrust Coversheet filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie. Refers to: Overton, Barbara; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Re Internal Affairs of Trust (Probate Code 17200) (Petition for Order: (1) Confirming Adam L. Gress as Successor Trustee; (2) Invalidating Declaration and Appointment of Co-Trustee...) filed by Gress, Adam L.; Adams, Linda Marie. Refers to: The Albinas E. and Rosemary M. Adams Living Trust dated October 18, 2000; Filed By: Gress, Adam L. (Petitioner); Adams, Linda Marie (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less