Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 20:24:46 (UTC).

Estate of Albert Lartigau

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Estate of Albert Lartigau was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia C. Kelety. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Julia C. Kelety

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Executor

Lartigau, Cheryl A.

Decedent

Lartigau, Albert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Executor Attorney

Webber, Alexandra

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JULIA PERKINS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition heard 08/11/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A..

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 11/05/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A..

Affidavit of Good Faith

Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A..

Response to Probate Notes

Response to Probate Notes filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A..

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 11/05/2020 01:30:00 PM.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A..

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final ($22,433.06) filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A..

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Spousal Property Petition was rescheduled to 08/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Spousal Property Petition scheduled for 08/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A..

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Spousal Property Petition was rescheduled to 06/02/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Spousal Property Petition scheduled for 06/02/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition

Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A.. Refers to: Lartigau, Albert

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Spousal Property Petition scheduled for 03/24/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal - Final ($22,433.06) filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A.. Filed By: Lartigau, Cheryl A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Probate filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A.. Filed By: Lartigau, Cheryl A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters Testamentary (Letters Expire: 05/05/2022) filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A.. Filed By: Lartigau, Cheryl A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketThe Petition - Other(Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act) filed by Cheryl A. Lartigau is granted. Court appointed Cheryl A. Lartigau as Executor for the Estate of Albert Lartigau on 11/05/2020. Letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSelf-Proving Will dated 10/12/17 admitted to probate on 11/05/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCourt updated role of Cheryl A. Lartigau to Executor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 11/05/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Probate Notes filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A.. Filed By: Lartigau, Cheryl A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A.. Filed By: Lartigau, Cheryl A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A.. Filed By: Lartigau, Cheryl A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition heard 08/11/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Spousal Property Petition was rescheduled to 08/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSpousal Property Petition scheduled for 08/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Spousal Property Petition was rescheduled to 06/02/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSpousal Property Petition scheduled for 06/02/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A.. Filed By: Lartigau, Cheryl A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSpousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition filed by Lartigau, Cheryl A.. Refers to: Lartigau, Albert Filed By: Lartigau, Cheryl A. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSpousal Property Petition scheduled for 03/24/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Webber, Alexandra T