This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 08:04:01 (UTC).

In Re the Advance Health Care Directive and Power of Attorney of: John Spencer Sloan also known as John S. Sloan

Case Summary

On 09/21/2017 In Re the Advance Health Care Directive and Power of Attorney of John Spencer Sloan also known as John S Sloan was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY BOSTWICK and ROBERT LONGSTRETH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY BOSTWICK

ROBERT LONGSTRETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCMAHAN, LINDA

Not Classified By Court

SLOAN, JOHN SPENCER

SLOAN, ANNE ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GROSS, CRAIG

Attorney at GOODWIN BROWN GROSS & LOVELACE LLP

4350 La Jolla Village Drive Ste 350

San Diego, CA 92121

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

DIDIER, ANDRE C

225 E 3Rd Ave

Escondido, CA 92025

ORTLIEB, RANDOLPH W

Attorney at PALOMAR LAW GROUP

225 E 3Rd Ave

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (Opposition By Objector, Anne Elizabeth Sloan, to Motion to Quash Subpoena By Petitioner, Linda Mcmahan) filed by Sloan, Anne Elizabeth.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Randolph W. Ortlieb in Support of Opposition By Objector, Anne Elizabeth Sloan, to Motion to Quash Subpoena By Petitioner, Linda Mcmahan; Attached Exhibits) filed by Sloan, Anne Elizabeth.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by McMahan, Linda.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena) filed by McMahan, Linda.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Subpoena

Motion - Other (Law & Motion: Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Subpoena; Memorandum in Support Thereof) filed by McMahan, Linda.

Separate statement in support of motion

Statement - Other (Law & Motion: Seperate Statement in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena) filed by McMahan, Linda.

Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Service) filed by Sloan, Anne Elizabeth.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Probate Case Management Conference heard 01/08/2018 02:45:00 PM.

Petition - Other

Petition - Other (Petition For Order: (1) Determining Purported 2017 Advance Health Care Directive and Power of Attorney are Ineffective and Invalid; (2) Determining September 16, 2005 Advance Health Care Directive and Power of Attorney are in Effect and Petitioner...) filed by McMahan, Linda. Refers to: Sloan, John

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Other (Miscellaneous) scheduled for 01/03/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-1 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet

Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by McMahan, Linda.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Ex Parte scheduled for 10/24/2017 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in PC-1 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Declaration Of Anne Sloan in Opposition to Ex Parte Petition

Declaration - Other filed by Sloan, Anne Elizabeth.

Declaration of Anne Elizabeth Sloan in Opposition to Ex Parte Petition

Declaration - Other filed by Sloan, Anne Elizabeth.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Objector Anne Elizabeth Sloan In Opposition To Petitioner Linda Mcmahan's Ex Parte Petition For A Restraining Order) filed by Sloan, Anne Elizabeth.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Bostwick, Jeffrey to Robert Longstreth effective 10/24/2017

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/25/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts (Amended) filed by McMahan, Linda.

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena) filed by McMahan, Linda. Filed By: McMahan, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Quash (Probate) scheduled for 08/10/2018 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • The Motion to Quash (Probate) was rescheduled to 08/10/2018 at 02:00:00 PM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by McMahan, Linda. Filed By: McMahan, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Opposition - Other filed by McMahan, Linda. Filed By: McMahan, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Service) filed by Sloan, Anne Elizabeth. Filed By: Sloan, Anne Elizabeth (Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Randolph W. Ortlieb in Support of Opposition By Objector, Anne Elizabeth Sloan, to Motion to Quash Subpoena By Petitioner, Linda Mcmahan; Attached Exhibits) filed by Sloan, Anne Elizabeth. Filed By: Sloan, Anne Elizabeth (Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition - Other (Opposition By Objector, Anne Elizabeth Sloan, to Motion to Quash Subpoena By Petitioner, Linda Mcmahan) filed by Sloan, Anne Elizabeth. Filed By: Sloan, Anne Elizabeth (Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Quash (Probate) scheduled for 07/06/2018 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Law & Motion: Declaration of Linda McMahan in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena) filed by McMahan, Linda. Filed By: McMahan, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by McMahan, Linda. Filed By: McMahan, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 10/24/2017 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in PC-1 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by McMahan, Linda. Filed By: McMahan, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex-Parte Petition for Order (1) Restraining Anne Elizabeth Sloan From Exercising Any Authority Over the Disposition of the Remains of the Deceased) filed by McMahan, Linda. Filed By: McMahan, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by McMahan, Linda. Filed By: McMahan, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Other (Miscellaneous) scheduled for 01/03/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-1 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (Petition For Order: (1) Determining Purported 2017 Advance Health Care Directive and Power of Attorney are Ineffective and Invalid; (2) Determining September 16, 2005 Advance Health Care Directive and Power of Attorney are in Effect and Petitioner...) filed by McMahan, Linda. Refers to: Sloan, John Filed By: McMahan, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less