This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 11:18:44 (UTC).

In Re Matter Of: The Dudley A' Neals Living Trust

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 In Re Matter Of The Dudley A' Neals Living Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BOSTWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BOSTWICK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARTLETT, DENISE

Not Classified By Court

IN RE MATTER OF: THE DUDLEY A'NEALS LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'CONNOR, TIMOTHY J

8001 Irvine Center Drive Suite 1550

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

Waiver of Notice

Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise.

Waiver of Notice

Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise.

Waiver of Notice

Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise.

Waiver of Notice

Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise.

Waiver of Notice

Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise.

Waiver of Notice

Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise.

Waiver of Notice

Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party heard 12/27/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Petition For Order Determining Trust's Title To Real Property

Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts filed by Bartlett, Denise. Refers to: In Re Matter Of: The Dudley A'Neals Living Trust

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-1 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Bartlett, Denise.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party heard 12/27/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts filed by Denise Bartlett was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise. Filed By: Bartlett, Denise (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise. Filed By: Bartlett, Denise (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise. Filed By: Bartlett, Denise (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise. Filed By: Bartlett, Denise (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise. Filed By: Bartlett, Denise (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise. Filed By: Bartlett, Denise (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice filed by Bartlett, Denise. Filed By: Bartlett, Denise (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Bartlett, Denise. Filed By: Bartlett, Denise (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition to Transfer Property Believed to Belong to Decedent or Other Interested Party scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-1 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Code 850 - Petition for Conveyance or Transfer of Property Claimed to Belong to Decedent or Other Person - Trusts filed by Bartlett, Denise. Refers to: In Re Matter Of: The Dudley A'Neals Living Trust Filed By: Bartlett, Denise (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less