This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 03:52:58 (UTC).

Hunt vs. State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California

Case Summary

On 04/26/2012 Hunt filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************M-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hunt, Thomas

Defendant

State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of th

Respondent

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, DIRECTOR OF THE DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Fremont, Michael J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Cardiff

Encinitas, CA 92007

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Hunt, Thomas. Refers to: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to stay of driving suspension) filed by Hunt, Thomas. Refers to: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/01/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Attachment - Other

Attachment - Other (Petitioner's verification) filed by Hunt, Thomas.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to stay suspension of driver's license) filed by Hunt, Thomas.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/03/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by Hunt, Thomas.

Answer

Answer (to Petition for Writ of Mandamus) filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California. Refers to: Hunt, Thomas

Reply to Opposition - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Hunt, Thomas. Refers to: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (to petition for writ of mandate) filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice (in support of opposition to petition for writ of mandate) filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California.

Reply to Opposition - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other (Supplemental Reply Memorandum) filed by Hunt, Thomas.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 06/29/2012 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment filed by Hunt, Thomas.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment filed by Hunt, Thomas. Filed By: Hunt, Thomas (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • Matter decided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 06/29/2012 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Matter taken under submission.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Tentative Ruling for Hearing on Petition published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Opposition - Other (Supplemental Reply Memorandum) filed by Hunt, Thomas. Filed By: Hunt, Thomas (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California. Filed By: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Judicial Notice (in support of opposition to petition for writ of mandate) filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California. Filed By: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2012
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 05/03/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Attachment - Other (Petitioner's verification) filed by Hunt, Thomas. Filed By: Hunt, Thomas (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/01/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • The petitioner's application to stay the suspension of the driver's license was denied without.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to stay of driving suspension) filed by Hunt, Thomas. Refers to: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California Filed By: Hunt, Thomas (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 05/01/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hunt, Thomas. Refers to: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California Filed By: Hunt, Thomas (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Hunt, Thomas. Refers to: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles, Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles of the State of California Filed By: Hunt, Thomas (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less