This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/06/2022 at 08:09:43 (UTC).

Hughes vs General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Hughes filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hughes, Ryan

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mikhov, Steve B

Attorney at KNIGHT LAW GROUP LLP

1801 Century Park East 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Demand for Jury Trial (Trial/Hearing Setting)

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC

Proof of Personal Service - Petition (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC Filed By: Hughes, Ryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC Filed By: Hughes, Ryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC Filed By: Hughes, Ryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC Filed By: Hughes, Ryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Hughes, Ryan. Refers to: General Motors LLC Filed By: Hughes, Ryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKHOV STEVE B