Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 08:25:11 (UTC).

HOXSIE VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 HOXSIE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOXSIE, GREG

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Basola, Jennifer

Attorney at KROHN AND MOSS LTD

Defendant Attorney

Quinn, Ashley E

Attorney at WILSON TURNER KOSMO LLP

 

Court Documents

Offer to Compromise and Notice of Acceptance

Offer to Compromise and Notice of Acceptance filed by HOXSIE, GREG.

Answer

Answer filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.

Complaint

Complaint filed by HOXSIE, GREG. Refers to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by HOXSIE, GREG. Refers to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HOXSIE, GREG. Refers to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOffer to Compromise and Notice of Acceptance filed by HOXSIE, GREG. Filed By: HOXSIE, GREG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. Filed By: FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by HOXSIE, GREG. Refers to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY Filed By: HOXSIE, GREG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by HOXSIE, GREG. Refers to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY Filed By: HOXSIE, GREG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by HOXSIE, GREG. Refers to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY Filed By: HOXSIE, GREG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BASOLA JENNIFER