This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 06:36:56 (UTC).

Housing Group Fund 401K Plan VS Tennison

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Housing Group Fund 401K Plan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tennison. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Housing Group Fund 401K Plan

Defendant

Tennison, Chris James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sheridan, Thomas B

Attorney at SHERIDAN LAW GROUP

193 Blue Ravine Road Suite 260

Folsom, CA 95630

Defendant Attorney

Khosroabadi, Sara

Attorney at KHOSROABADI & HILL APC

Suite 3A5, 2535 Kettner Blvd

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Housing Group Fund 401K Plan. Refers to: Tennison, Chris

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Housing Group Fund 401K Plan. Refers to: Tennison, Chris

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Housing Group Fund 401K Plan. Refers to: Tennison, Chris

Answer

Answer filed by Tennison, Chris James.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Unconditional Settlement

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Housing Group Fund 401K Plan. Refers to: Tennison, Chris

Notice to Filing Party SD

Case Management Statement submitted by Tennison, Chris James rejected on 07/09/2021.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 07/30/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in C-69 before Katherine Bacal at Central.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Housing Group Fund 401K Plan. Refers to: Tennison, Chris Filed By: Housing Group Fund 401K Plan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement submitted by Tennison, Chris James rejected on 07/09/2021. Filed By: Tennison, Chris James (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 07/30/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in C-69 before Katherine Bacal at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Tennison, Chris James. Filed By: Tennison, Chris James (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Housing Group Fund 401K Plan. Refers to: Tennison, Chris Filed By: Housing Group Fund 401K Plan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Housing Group Fund 401K Plan. Refers to: Tennison, Chris Filed By: Housing Group Fund 401K Plan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Housing Group Fund 401K Plan. Refers to: Tennison, Chris Filed By: Housing Group Fund 401K Plan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Housing Group Fund 401K Plan. Refers to: Tennison, Chris Filed By: Housing Group Fund 401K Plan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSING GROUP FUND 401K PENSION PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheridan, Thomas Blaine