This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 12:45:21 (UTC).

Houser vs Lau

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Houser filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Lau. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Houser, Joseph

Respondent

LAU, BILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Yum, Anna R

Respondent Attorney

Phillips, Frederick C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 2201 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order reassigned to Frederic L. Link 2201 on 02/26/2020 at 09:30AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/26/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 04/24/2020 at 09:00AM in Department 2201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/26/2020 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (TOM HOM) filed by Houser, Joseph. Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOpposition - Other (Declaration of Frederick Phillips in opposition to request for Civil Harrassment Restraining Order) filed by Houser, Joseph. Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration in opposition to restraining order) filed by Houser, Joseph. Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (William Lau) filed by Houser, Joseph. Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Houser, Joseph. Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Houser, Joseph. Refers to: LAU, BILL Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Houser, Joseph. Refers to: LAU, BILL Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Houser, Joseph. Refers to: Houser, Shari; Houser, Skyla; LAU, BILL Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Houser, Joseph. Refers to: Houser, Shari; Houser, Skyla; LAU, BILL Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/11/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Houser, Joseph. Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Houser, Joseph. Filed By: Houser, Joseph (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillips, Frederick C