This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/22/2020 at 06:18:24 (UTC).

Holt vs Meteraud-Ortiz

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 Holt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Meteraud-Ortiz. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holt, Barbara L

Defendant

Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen Ann; DBA : Rover

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Babbitt, Edward J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD J BABBITT

Defendant Attorney

BURTON, SCOTT R

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holt, Barbara L. Refers to: Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen

Complaint

Complaint filed by Holt, Barbara L. Refers to: Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Holt, Barbara L. Refers to: Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Trapp, Randa to Richard Strauss effective 10/25/2019

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge (Order Signed by Judge R. Trapp) filed by Holt, Barbara L.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Holt, Barbara L.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Holt, Barbara L. Refers to: Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen

Answer

Answer filed by Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen Ann.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/13/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Pltf's Ex Parte Application to Set Aside Request for Dismissal) filed by Holt, Barbara L.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Holt, Barbara L.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Holt, Barbara L.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Holt, Barbara L. Filed By: Holt, Barbara L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen Ann .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Holt, Barbara L .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/13/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Pltf's Ex Parte Application to Set Aside Request for Dismissal) filed by Holt, Barbara L. Filed By: Holt, Barbara L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 02/13/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen Ann. Filed By: Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen Ann (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Holt, Barbara L. Filed By: Holt, Barbara L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen Ann .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge (Order Signed by Judge R. Trapp) filed by Holt, Barbara L. Filed By: Holt, Barbara L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Holt, Barbara L. Refers to: Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen Filed By: Holt, Barbara L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Holt, Barbara L. Refers to: Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen Filed By: Holt, Barbara L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holt, Barbara L. Refers to: Meteraud-Ortiz, Kathleen Filed By: Holt, Barbara L (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less