This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 05:48:42 (UTC).

Holsapple vs Fay Servicing LLC

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 Holsapple filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Fay Servicing LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holsapple, Alan

Defendants

Fay Servicing LLC

US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee of VRMTG Asset Trust

ZBS LAW LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shapero, Sarah E

Attorney at SHAPERO LAW FIRM

100 Pine Center, 100 Pine St Ste 530

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Klein, Bradford E.

30 Corporate Park #450

Irvine, CA 92606

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Holsapple, Alan received but not filed on 01/04/2022.

DECLARATION OF ALAN HOLSAPPLE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE FORECLOSURE SALE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPERTY

Declaration - Other (OF ALAN HOLSAPPLE) filed by Holsapple, Alan.

DECLARATION OF KAYLEE MCCARTY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN FORECLOSURE SALE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPERTY

Declaration - Other (OF KAYLEE MCCARTY) filed by Holsapple, Alan.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Holsapple, Alan.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN FORECLOSURE SALE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPERTY

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER) filed by Holsapple, Alan.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee of VRMTG Asset Trust; ZBS LAW LLP

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee of VRMTG Asset Trust; ZBS LAW LLP

Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief

Complaint filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee of VRMTG Asset Trust; ZBS LAW LLP

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: ZBS LAW LLP

Declaration of Non-Monetary Status (First Papers)

Declaration of Non-Monetary Status filed by ZBS LAW LLP.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Holsapple, Alan.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/26/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Holsapple, Alan.; Filed By: Holsapple, Alan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Holsapple, Alan .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee of VRMTG Asset Trust.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to ZBS LAW LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Fay Servicing LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Monetary Status filed by ZBS LAW LLP.; Filed By: ZBS LAW LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: ZBS LAW LLP; Filed By: Holsapple, Alan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Holsapple, Alan received but not filed on 01/04/2022.; Filed By: Holsapple, Alan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER) filed by Holsapple, Alan.; Filed By: Holsapple, Alan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Filed By: Holsapple, Alan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/26/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee of VRMTG Asset Trust; ZBS LAW LLP; Filed By: Holsapple, Alan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee of VRMTG Asset Trust; ZBS LAW LLP; Filed By: Holsapple, Alan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Holsapple, Alan. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee of VRMTG Asset Trust; ZBS LAW LLP; Filed By: Holsapple, Alan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZBS LAW LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Fay Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLEIN BRADFORD