Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 10:46:05 (UTC).

Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC VS Lopez

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lopez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC

Defendant

Lopez, Zuriel Abraham

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chandra, Sam

Defendant Attorney

La Costa, Joseph

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel

UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC.

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Request for Entry of Default

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (and Unknowns) filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel

Judgment

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and Unknowns) filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Lopez, Zuriel Abraham.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Lopez, Zuriel Abraham. Refers to: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Lopez, Zuriel Abraham, on 11/06/2020, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Lopez, Zuriel Abraham, on 11/06/2020, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/09/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Lopez, Zuriel Abraham. Filed By: Lopez, Zuriel Abraham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Lopez, Zuriel Abraham. Filed By: Lopez, Zuriel Abraham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Lopez, Zuriel Abraham. Refers to: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC Filed By: Lopez, Zuriel Abraham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Lopez, Zuriel Abraham. Refers to: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC Filed By: Lopez, Zuriel Abraham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 11/09/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-60 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (and Unknowns) filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel Filed By: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC and against Lopez, Zuriel Abraham for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Not entered) filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel Filed By: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel Filed By: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel Filed By: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel Filed By: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel Filed By: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel Filed By: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC. Refers to: Lopez, Zuriel Filed By: Hollyvale Rental Holdings LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hollyvale Rental Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer La Costa, Joseph