Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 01:35:15 (UTC).

Holland vs. Vita

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Holland filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Vita. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Holland, Ashley

Respondent

Vita, Lauren E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-03; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order - Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Holland, Ashley. Refers to: Vita, Lauren Filed By: Holland, Ashley (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 04/14/2021 at 08:30AM in Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/17/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Holland, Ashley. Refers to: Vita, Lauren Filed By: Holland, Ashley (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Holland, Ashley. Refers to: Vita, Lauren Filed By: Holland, Ashley (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holland, Ashley. Refers to: Vita, Lauren Filed By: Holland, Ashley (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (TRO DENIED) filed by Holland, Ashley. Filed By: Holland, Ashley (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/17/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less