This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/26/2023 at 01:34:25 (UTC).

Holiday vs Burger King Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Holiday filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Burger King Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holiday, Mychiglen

Defendants

Burger King Company LLC

Burger King Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nalbandyan, Arutyun Harry

811 Wilshire Boulevard 800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Holiday, Mychiglen. Refers to: Burger King Corporation; Burger King Company LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holiday, Mychiglen. Refers to: Burger King Corporation; Burger King Company LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Holiday, Mychiglen. Refers to: Burger King Corporation; Burger King Company LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Holiday, Mychiglen.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Holiday, Mychiglen.; Filed By: Holiday, Mychiglen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Holiday, Mychiglen. Refers to: Burger King Corporation; Burger King Company LLC; Filed By: Holiday, Mychiglen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holiday, Mychiglen. Refers to: Burger King Corporation; Burger King Company LLC; Filed By: Holiday, Mychiglen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Holiday, Mychiglen. Refers to: Burger King Corporation; Burger King Company LLC; Filed By: Holiday, Mychiglen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less