Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 08:39:56 (UTC).

HOADLEY vs HOWARD

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 HOADLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOWARD. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hoadley, Melissa

Defendants

Howard, Margaux Renee

Howard, Nelson

Enriquez, Aleyna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kitay, Howard Alan

Defendant Attorney

Michael, Christina F

Attorney at DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Nelson Howard) filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Nelson

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Margaux Renee Howard) filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Margaux

Answer

Answer filed by Howard, Margaux Renee; Howard, Nelson.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Howard, Margaux Renee; Howard, Nelson.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hoadley, Melissa.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Margaux; Howard, Nelson; Enriquez, Aleyna

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Margaux; Howard, Nelson; Enriquez, Aleyna

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Margaux; Howard, Nelson; Enriquez, Aleyna

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Filed By: Hoadley, Melissa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Howard, Margaux Renee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Howard, Nelson .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Enriquez, Aleyna .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hoadley, Melissa .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Howard, Margaux Renee; Howard, Nelson. Filed By: Howard, Margaux Renee (Defendant); Howard, Nelson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Howard, Margaux Renee; Howard, Nelson. Filed By: Howard, Margaux Renee (Defendant); Howard, Nelson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Nelson Howard) filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Nelson Filed By: Hoadley, Melissa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (as to Margaux Renee Howard) filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Margaux Filed By: Hoadley, Melissa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Margaux; Howard, Nelson; Enriquez, Aleyna Filed By: Hoadley, Melissa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Margaux; Howard, Nelson; Enriquez, Aleyna Filed By: Hoadley, Melissa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hoadley, Melissa. Refers to: Howard, Margaux; Howard, Nelson; Enriquez, Aleyna Filed By: Hoadley, Melissa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kitay, Howard Alan