This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/06/2018 at 01:06:22 (UTC).

Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC vs. Spencer

Case Summary

On 12/06/2013 Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Spencer. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Appellants and Respondents

Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC

Historic Barcelona Apartments, LLC

Spencer, Joseph

HISTORIC BARCELONA APARTMENTS LLC

HISTORIC BARCELONA INVESTMENT LLC

HERRICK-SPENCER, CATHY

SAMMAD ATTISHA AS TRUSTEE OF THE SAMMAD ATTISHA FAMILY TRUST

STONE, VICKIE S

STONE JR, DANIEL C

DANIEL C STONE JR AS TRUSTEE OF THE STONE FAMILY TRUST

CATHY HERRICK-SPENCER AS TRUSTEE OF THE CATHY HERRICK-SPENCER FAMILY TRUST

DANIEL C STONE JR AS BENEFICIARY OF AN IRA WITH EQUITY TRUST CO; DBA : STERLING TRUST

JOSEPH CANFORA AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOSEPH CANFORA DEMACO TRUST

VICKIE S STONE AS BENEFICIARY OF AN IRA WITH EQUITY TRUST CO; DBA : STERLING TRUST

WOLSKI, BRUCE

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant, Appellant and Respondent Attorneys

Blechschmidt, Bart

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BART BLECHSCHMIDT

100 Palomar Airport Road

Carlsbad, CA 92008

FRYE, AUTUMN S

Attorney at MILTNER & MENCK

402 W Broadway #800

San Diego, CA 92101

MILTNER, WILLIAM L

Attorney at MILTNER & MENCK APC

402 W Broadway #800

San Diego, CA 92101

FUSELIER, LOWELL ROBERT

Attorney at BUSINESS LAW GROUP APC

5946 Priestly Dr #102

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

of Lowell Robert Fuselier in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees

Declaration - Other (of Lowell Robert Fuselier in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees) filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC; Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC.

Memorandum of Costs Summary

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Wolski, Bruce; Herrick-Spencer, Cathy; Cathy Herrick-Spencer as Trustee of the Cathy Herrick-Spencer Family Trust; Daniel C Stone Jr as beneficiary of an IRA with Equity Trust Co; Daniel C Stone Jr as Trustee of the Stone Family Trust; Stone, Daniel C Jr; Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC; Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC; Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC; Joseph Canfora as Trustee of the Joseph Canfora Demaco Trust;OTHERS.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC. Refers to: Spencer, Joseph

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation & order to continue trial and related dates) filed by Spencer, Joseph.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/15/2015 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/06/2015 09:00:00 AM.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (BRIANNA HARO - GRANTED) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 05/11/2015 09:00:00 AM.

Opposition to Motion in Limine

Opposition to Motion in Limine (Oppo to Pltf's MIL 4 of 14) filed by Spencer, Joseph; Historic Barcelona Investment LLC.

Opposition to Motion in Limine

Opposition to Motion in Limine (Oppo to Pltf's MIL 6 of 14) filed by Historic Barcelona Investment LLC; Spencer, Joseph.

Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine (MIL 9 of 14 to exclude any evidence that the $900,000 celtic Note had any value at the time it was transferred to Beaumanor, LLC) filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC; Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC.

Jury Note and Responses

Jury Note and Responses (JURY NOTE 1) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/23/2015 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/18/2015 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

Notice of Appeal

[Another document for ROA# 289]

Notice of Default SD

Notice of Default SD generated.

241 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC. Filed By: Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Ruling filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC. Filed By: Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/23/2018 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC. Filed By: Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order (Re: Motion to Compel) submitted by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC received but not filed on 03/15/2018. Filed By: Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Joseph A Lara) filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC. Filed By: Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement - Other (Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses) filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC. Filed By: Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC. Filed By: Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed by Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC. Filed By: Historic Barcelona Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
390 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2013
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/06/2014 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed by Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC. Filed By: Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Peremptory Challenge (Granted) filed by Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC. Filed By: Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/06/2014 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC. Refers to: Spencer, Joseph Filed By: Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC. Refers to: Spencer, Joseph Filed By: Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC. Refers to: Spencer, Joseph Filed By: Historic Beaumanor Apartments LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.