This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/22/2022 at 01:43:46 (UTC).

Hicks vs Lamb

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Hicks filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lamb. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hicks, Razvan

Defendant

LAMB, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallenstein, Robert L

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hicks, Razvan. Refers to: LAMB, ROBERT

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint filed by Hicks, Razvan. Refers to: LAMB, ROBERT

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hicks, Razvan. Refers to: LAMB, ROBERT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hicks, Razvan. Refers to: LAMB, ROBERT; Filed By: Hicks, Razvan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/29/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hicks, Razvan. Refers to: LAMB, ROBERT; Filed By: Hicks, Razvan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hicks, Razvan. Refers to: LAMB, ROBERT; Filed By: Hicks, Razvan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hicks, Razvan. Refers to: LAMB, ROBERT; Filed By: Hicks, Razvan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less