This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 06:22:37 (UTC).

Hicks vs Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Hicks filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hicks, Randall Stacey

Defendants

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Topp, Charles

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnson, Melissa

2727 Camino Del Rio S Ste 140

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Topp, Charles

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey. Refers to: Topp, Charles; Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Amended Complaint

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey.; Filed By: Hicks, Randall Stacey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey.; Filed By: Hicks, Randall Stacey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey. Refers to: Topp, Charles; Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Filed By: Hicks, Randall Stacey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey.; Filed By: Hicks, Randall Stacey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hicks, Randall Stacey. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Topp, Charles; Filed By: Hicks, Randall Stacey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant