This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2022 at 07:13:57 (UTC).

HG Fenton Company vs Barnett Quality Control Services Inc

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 HG Fenton Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Barnett Quality Control Services Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fenton Erma Road LLC

HG Fenton Company

HG Fenton Development Company LLC

Defendants

Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; AKA : NOVA Services

Ledcor Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chalifoux, Anthony Scott

Attorney at BALESTRERI POTOCKI & HOLMES LAW CORPORATION

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

[A document for ROA# 2]

Certificate of Merit (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Certificate of Merit filed by HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC; Fenton Erma Road LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; Ledcor Construction Inc

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC; Fenton Erma Road LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; Ledcor Construction Inc

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC; Fenton Erma Road LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; Ledcor Construction Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Fenton Erma Road LLC; HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Fenton Erma Road LLC; HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; Filed By: Fenton Erma Road LLC (Plaintiff); HG Fenton Company (Plaintiff); HG Fenton Development Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC; Fenton Erma Road LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; Ledcor Construction Inc; Filed By: HG Fenton Company (Plaintiff); HG Fenton Development Company LLC (Plaintiff); Fenton Erma Road LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 5]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC; Fenton Erma Road LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; Ledcor Construction Inc; Filed By: HG Fenton Company (Plaintiff); HG Fenton Development Company LLC (Plaintiff); Fenton Erma Road LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Merit filed by HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC; Fenton Erma Road LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; Ledcor Construction Inc; Filed By: HG Fenton Company (Plaintiff); HG Fenton Development Company LLC (Plaintiff); Fenton Erma Road LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC; Fenton Erma Road LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; Ledcor Construction Inc; Filed By: HG Fenton Company (Plaintiff); HG Fenton Development Company LLC (Plaintiff); Fenton Erma Road LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by HG Fenton Company; HG Fenton Development Company LLC; Fenton Erma Road LLC. Refers to: Barnett Quality Control Services Inc; Ledcor Construction Inc; Filed By: HG Fenton Company (Plaintiff); HG Fenton Development Company LLC (Plaintiff); Fenton Erma Road LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less