This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 04:01:43 (UTC).

Herrera vs Chase Bank

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Herrera filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Chase Bank. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Herrera, Jessie

Defendant

Chase Bank

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Underpayment of Filing Fees

Notice of Underpayment of Filing Fees

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Underpayment of Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Herrera, Jessie. Refers to: Chase Bank Filed By: Herrera, Jessie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant