This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 08:15:23 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ vs VISTA WOODS HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against VISTA WOODS HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo

Defendants

GARDNER, CLAY

The Ensign Group Inc

VISTA WOODS HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC; DBA : VISTA KNOLL SPECIALIZED CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bibiyan, David D.

8484 Wilshire Boulevard Ste 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Bils, Jeffrey C

8484 Wilshire Boulevard 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Shirian, Joshua

8484 Wilshire Boulevard 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo. Refers to: VISTA WOODS HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC; The Ensign Group Inc; GARDNER, CLAY

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo. Refers to: VISTA WOODS HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC; The Ensign Group Inc; GARDNER, CLAY

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo. Refers to: VISTA WOODS HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC; The Ensign Group Inc; GARDNER, CLAY

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo; Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo; Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo; Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo; Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo.; Filed By: Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo (Plaintiff); Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo (Plaintiff); Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo.; Filed By: Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo. Refers to: VISTA WOODS HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC; The Ensign Group Inc; GARDNER, CLAY; Filed By: Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo. Refers to: VISTA WOODS HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC; The Ensign Group Inc; GARDNER, CLAY; Filed By: Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo. Refers to: VISTA WOODS HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC; The Ensign Group Inc; GARDNER, CLAY; Filed By: Hernandez, Isibet Fajardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vista Woods Health Associates is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ENSIGN GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BILS JEFFREY CHARLES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIBIYAN DAVID D.