This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 08:18:11 (UTC).

Hernandez vs Stanley Black & Decker Inc

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Hernandez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Stanley Black Decker Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez, Alexa

Defendants

BLACK & DECKER US INC

Stanley Black & Decker Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kim, Jace Hyun

3250 Wilshire Blvd #2200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

CRISP, KEVIN R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: Stanley Black & Decker Inc; BLACK & DECKER US INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: Stanley Black & Decker Inc; BLACK & DECKER US INC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: Stanley Black & Decker Inc; BLACK & DECKER US INC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: Stanley Black & Decker Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: BLACK & DECKER US INC

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Stanley Black & Decker Inc; BLACK & DECKER US INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Stanley Black & Decker Inc; BLACK & DECKER US INC.; Filed By: Stanley Black & Decker Inc (Defendant); BLACK & DECKER US INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: BLACK & DECKER US INC; Filed By: Hernandez, Alexa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: Stanley Black & Decker Inc; Filed By: Hernandez, Alexa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/28/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: Stanley Black & Decker Inc; BLACK & DECKER US INC; Filed By: Hernandez, Alexa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: Stanley Black & Decker Inc; BLACK & DECKER US INC; Filed By: Hernandez, Alexa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hernandez, Alexa. Refers to: Stanley Black & Decker Inc; BLACK & DECKER US INC; Filed By: Hernandez, Alexa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACK & DECKER (U.S.) INC. trading and doing business as PORTER- CABLE is a litigant

Latest cases where STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JACE H. ESQ.