This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 08:03:15 (UTC).

Hernandez vs MANDEX Inc

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 Hernandez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MANDEX Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez, Kyle

Defendants

Apex Systems LLC

MANDEX Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Granieri, Christy W

Defendant Attorney

VIOLA, JOHN L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hernandez, Kyle. Refers to: MANDEX Inc; Apex Systems LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hernandez, Kyle. Refers to: MANDEX Inc; Apex Systems LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Kyle. Refers to: MANDEX Inc; Apex Systems LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Stays)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by MANDEX Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by MANDEX Inc.; Filed By: MANDEX Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Kyle. Refers to: MANDEX Inc; Apex Systems LLC; Filed By: Hernandez, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hernandez, Kyle. Refers to: MANDEX Inc; Apex Systems LLC; Filed By: Hernandez, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hernandez, Kyle. Refers to: MANDEX Inc; Apex Systems LLC; Filed By: Hernandez, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less