This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 10:02:11 (UTC).

Hernandez vs Grossmont Union High School District

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 Hernandez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Grossmont Union High School District. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez, Angel

Defendant

Grossmont Union High School District

Guardian Ad Litem

Hernandez, Claudia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rogal, Justin R

Attorney at MANN ROGAL LLP

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 630

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

Creighton, Jennifer S

Attorney at WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1215 W Vista Way

Vista, CA 92083-6227

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/09/2022 09:00:00 AM.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order

Reply filed by Hernandez, Angel.

Proof of Service- Opposition

Proof of Service filed by Grossmont Union High School District.

Proof of Service - Dec

Proof of Service filed by Grossmont Union High School District.

Declaration of Jennifer S Creighton in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Order Pursuant to Education Code Section 49076 for Release of Education Records

Declaration - Other filed by Grossmont Union High School District.

Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Court ORder Pursuant to Education Code Section 49076 For Release of Education Records

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Grossmont Union High School District.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/30/2022 10:30:00 AM.

Motion - For Court Order Pursuant to Education Code Section 49076

Motion - Other (FOR RELEASE OF EDUCATION RECORDS) filed by Hernandez, Angel.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hernandez, Angel.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Hernandez, Angel.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Grossmont Union High School District.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Grossmont Union High School District.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (by Electronic Service) filed by Grossmont Union High School District.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Grossmont Union High School District.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hernandez, Angel. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2024
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/09/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply filed by Hernandez, Angel.; Filed By: Hernandez, Angel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Grossmont Union High School District.; Filed By: Grossmont Union High School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Grossmont Union High School District.; Filed By: Grossmont Union High School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Grossmont Union High School District.; Filed By: Grossmont Union High School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Grossmont Union High School District.; Filed By: Grossmont Union High School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/30/2022 10:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Grossmont Union High School District.; Filed By: Grossmont Union High School District (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hernandez, Angel. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District; Filed By: Hernandez, Angel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Hernandez, Angel. Refers to: Hernandez, Claudia; Grossmont Union High School District; Filed By: Hernandez, Angel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hernandez, Angel. Refers to: Hernandez, Claudia; Grossmont Union High School District; Filed By: Hernandez, Angel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Angel. Refers to: Hernandez, Claudia; Grossmont Union High School District; Filed By: Hernandez, Angel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hernandez, Angel. Refers to: Hernandez, Claudia; Grossmont Union High School District; Filed By: Hernandez, Angel (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Grossmont Union High School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROGAL JUSTIN REUBEN