This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/23/2023 at 08:06:19 (UTC).

Hernandez vs C & B Delivery Service

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 Hernandez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against C B Delivery Service. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez, Victor

Defendants

Barrett Business Services Inc

C & B Delivery Service

Home Express Delivery Sersvice LLC; DBA : TEMCO Logistics

HOME EXPRESS DELIVERY SERVICE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gallagher, Sarah

Defendant Attorneys

Dalby, David Ian

MIRRAFATI, KAMRAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hernandez, Victor. Refers to: C & B Delivery Service; Home Express Delivery Sersvice LLC; Barrett Business Services Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Victor. Refers to: C & B Delivery Service; Home Express Delivery Sersvice LLC; Barrett Business Services Inc

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hernandez, Victor. Refers to: C & B Delivery Service; Home Express Delivery Sersvice LLC; Barrett Business Services Inc

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Hernandez, Victor. Refers to: Barrett Business Services Inc; C & B Delivery Service; Home Express Delivery Sersvice LLC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Hernandez, Victor.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Hernandez, Victor.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by C & B Delivery Service; HOME EXPRESS DELIVERY SERVICE LLC.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Barrett Business Services Inc.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Barrett Business Services Inc.; Filed By: Barrett Business Services Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by C & B Delivery Service; HOME EXPRESS DELIVERY SERVICE LLC.; Filed By: C & B Delivery Service (Defendant); HOME EXPRESS DELIVERY SERVICE LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hernandez, Victor.; Filed By: Hernandez, Victor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hernandez, Victor.; Filed By: Hernandez, Victor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Hernandez, Victor. Refers to: Barrett Business Services Inc; C & B Delivery Service; Home Express Delivery Sersvice LLC; Filed By: Hernandez, Victor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hernandez, Victor. Refers to: C & B Delivery Service; Home Express Delivery Sersvice LLC; Barrett Business Services Inc; Filed By: Hernandez, Victor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Victor. Refers to: C & B Delivery Service; Home Express Delivery Sersvice LLC; Barrett Business Services Inc; Filed By: Hernandez, Victor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hernandez, Victor. Refers to: C & B Delivery Service; Home Express Delivery Sersvice LLC; Barrett Business Services Inc; HOME EXPRESS DELIVERY SERVICE LLC; Filed By: Hernandez, Victor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less