This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 04:00:36 (UTC).

Hernandez vs Best Buy Stores LP

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Hernandez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Best Buy Stores LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hernandez, Andres

San Diego, CA 92167

Nassar, Linda

San Diego, CA 92167

Defendant

Best Buy Stores LP

 

Court Documents

Request - Other

Request - Other (Request for Service by Certified Mail) filed by Hernandez, Andres; Nassar, Linda. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Nassar, Linda.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Hernandez, Andres.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Hernandez, Andres; Nassar, Linda. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk filed by Hernandez, Andres. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-63; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk filed by Hernandez, Andres. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP Filed By: Hernandez, Andres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 03/28/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Hernandez, Andres. Filed By: Hernandez, Andres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Nassar, Linda. Filed By: Nassar, Linda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCertified Mail Green Card Tracking Numbers filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Hernandez, Andres; Nassar, Linda. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP Filed By: Hernandez, Andres (Plaintiff); Nassar, Linda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Hernandez, Andres. Filed By: Hernandez, Andres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Nassar, Linda. Filed By: Nassar, Linda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Other (Request for Service by Certified Mail) filed by Hernandez, Andres; Nassar, Linda. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP Filed By: Hernandez, Andres (Plaintiff); Nassar, Linda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST BUY STORES L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant